Airia, Parisa (CPSO#: 93788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Dr., Suite #112
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 530-1073
Fax: (416) 530-4865
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parisa Airia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Airia ( CPSO# 93788 )

Business Address:
1 - 71 Howard Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 530-1073

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARISA AIRIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIRIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012