Akcakir, Berna (CPSO#: 68331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 231-6849
Fax: (613) 232-4818
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Room C141
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Canada
Phone: 613-727-4723 Ext. 7222
Fax: 613-727-3166
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNA AKCAKIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKCAKIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996