Aksoy, Tuba (CPSO#: 95522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8707 Dufferin St, Unit 26
Thornhill ON  L4J0A2
Phone: 905-889-4040
Fax: 905-889-4848
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUBA AKSOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKSOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017