Al Hadi, Mouafak (CPSO#: 84378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Czech, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 150
2120 Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone: (705) 377-5371
Fax: (705) 377-5372
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stadnyk Jeeves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. O'Connor ( CPSO# 72515 )
Dr. M. Reade ( CPSO# 77096 )
Dr. A. Stadnyk ( CPSO# 33598 )
Dr. M. Al Hadi ( CPSO# 84378 )
Dr. M. Harelnikava ( CPSO# 99499 )
Dr. N. Jeeves ( CPSO# 62587 )

Business Address:
2120B Highway 551
P.O. Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371


Corporation Name: Dr. Mouafak Al Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al Hadi ( CPSO# 84378 )

Business Address:
2120B Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-4584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOUAFAK AL HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008