Al-Battran, Mazin Hasan Mossa (CPSO#: 90394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saddam College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Psychiatry Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2313
Fax: (519) 749-4289
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Westmount Long Term Care
200 David Bergy Drive
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener ON  N2E 3Y4
Canada
Phone: (519) 570-2115
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Nithview Community Long Term Care
200 Boullee Street
New Hamburg ON  N3A 2K4
Canada
Phone: (519) 662-2280
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Lanark Heights Long Term Care
46 Lanark Crescent
Kitchener ON  N2N2Z8
Canada
Phone: (519) 743-4200
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Thresholds Homes and Supports
236 Victoria St. N., Unit 2A
Kitchener ON  N2H 5C8
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3191
Fax: 5197425232
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Parkwood Mennonite Home
726 New Hampshire Street
Waterloo ON  N2K 4M1
Canada
Phone: 5197494300 Ext. 2313
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

115 Delhi Street
Guelph, Ontario
N1E 4J4
Guelph ON  N1E4J4
Canada
Phone: 519822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al-Battran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Battran ( CPSO# 90394 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Psychiatry Department
835 King Street West
Waterloo ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Parkwood Mennonite Home
726 New Hampshire Street
Waterloo ON  N2K 4M1

Business Address:
The Westmount Long Term Care
200 David Bergey Drive
Kitchener ON  N2E 3Y4

Business Address:
Thresholds homes and Supports
2A- 236 Victoria Street North
Kitchener ON  N2H 5C8

Business Address:
Nithview Community Long Term Care
200 Boullee Street
New Hamburg ON  N3A 2K4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAZIN HASAN MOSSA AL-BATTRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BATTRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2010