Al-Dhaher, Firas Fadhel (CPSO#: 82436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
4130 Glenview Road
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: (519) 882-4321
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firas F. Al-Dhaher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Dhaher ( CPSO# 82436 )

Business Address:
P.O. Box 640
3 - 4130 Glenview Road
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIRAS FADHEL AL-DHAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DHAHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007