Al-Mousawy, Saif (CPSO#: 95809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: 905-336-6480
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Accurate Heart
Diagnostic Centre Inc.
Unit 205 - 100 Pertosa Dr.
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Canada
Phone: 905-796-7333
Fax: 905-796-7370
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 103
56 Westmore Dr.
Etobicoke ON  M9V3Y6
Canada
Phone: 416-748-5656
Fax: 416-748-9391
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saif Al-Mousawy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Mousawy ( CPSO# 95809 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIF AL-MOUSAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MOUSAWY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015