Al-Selahi, Eiman Mohammad S A (CPSO#: 86087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mcmaster hospital
Department of Allergy/immunology
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76374
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3885 Duke of York Blvd C107
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 366-4441
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EIMAN MOHAMMAD S A AL-SELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SELAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 May 2007 to 30 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 21 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 22 Mar 2010 to 31 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 May 2010 to 31 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Nov 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017