Al-Tatari, Hossam Mohamed (CPSO#: 85380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 55534
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hossam Al-Tatari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Hossam   Mohamed   Al-Tatari   may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Paediatrics, only.