Al-Tukmachi, Ahmad Mohammed Shihab (CPSO#: 94408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kufa University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
53 Main St W
Dundalk ON  N0C 1B0
Phone: (519) 923-3456
Fax: (519) 371-5995
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1230 NORTH SHORE BLVD E
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: 905 632 3737 Ext. 4116
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

55 ISLA ST
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Canada
Phone: (519) 986-3040
Fax: (519) 986-3779
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Tukmachi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Tukmachi ( CPSO# 94408 )

Business Address:
Dundalk Medical Clinic
53 Main Street West
Dundalk ON  N0C 1B0
Phone Number: (519) 923-3456

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHAMMED SHIHAB AL-TUKMACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-TUKMACHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2014