Alam, Nadia (CPSO#: 84561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sinclair Medical Associates
99 Sinclair Ave, Suite 204
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone: 9058733344
Fax: (905) 873-8094
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthservices - Georgetown
1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-3344
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alam ( CPSO# 84561 )

Business Address:
Halton Health Services - Georgetown
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B6
Phone Number: (905) 873-3344

Business Address:
99 Sinclair Avenue
Suite 204
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone Number: (905) 873-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009