Alavi, Shazia (CPSO#: 81994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: 5196234200
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: S. Alavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alavi ( CPSO# 81994 )

Business Address:
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAZIA ALAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 18 Oct 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2005 to 17 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Oct 2005 to 17 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006