Alawsi, Maysarah A (CPSO#: 89761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
261 Oak Walk Dr
Oakville ON  L6H 6M3
Phone: (905) 257-8004
Fax: (905)257-8006
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4646 Heritage Hills Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5R1Y3
Canada
Phone: 905-232-4232
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maysarah Alawsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alawsi ( CPSO# 89761 )

Business Address:
261 oak Walk Drive
Oakville ON  L6H 6M3
Phone Number: (647) 839-7107

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYSARAH A ALAWSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAWSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010