Algird, Almunder Ramah R (CPSO#: 76882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2013

Expiry Date:  04 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Room 715
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44525
Fax: (905) 577-1487
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karah Algird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karah ( CPSO# 81184 )
Dr. A. Algird ( CPSO# 76882 )

Business Address:
208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 715
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Neurosurgery Effective: 05 Sep 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 16 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2002 to 16 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2003 to 16 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2004 to 16 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2005 to 16 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 17 Jul 2006 to 16 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Almunder Ramah R. Algird may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        McMaster   University,  in  which  Dr.  Algird  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Algird  no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Algird's clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Algird's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  September  5, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 4, 2020.