Ali, Fahim Husayn (CPSO#: 76181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 840-2475
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Eye Consultants
16945 Leslie Street
Unit #44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Canada
Phone: (289) 221-8837
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Durham EndoSurgery Centre
95 Bayly Street West
Suite B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-2028
Fax: (905) 426-2033
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Dr. Craig & Associates
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-6294
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Dr. Sami Ullah
371 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 2Z7
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-7150
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Rudd Clinic
Suite 400
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-597-0997
Fax: 416-597-2912
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Endoscopy Centre
Suite A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A3R9
Canada
Phone: 905-495-5200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Ancaster Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 205
1144 Wislon Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G3K9
Canada
Phone: 905-304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Advance Endoscopy & Specialist
Centre, Suite 303
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L3R6
Canada
Phone: 905-569-7007
Fax: 905-569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Grand Genesis Health
Unit 12, Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Oakville Provis-Rudd Clinic
Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K3V2
Canada
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Kawartha Lakes, Ontario
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry, Ontario
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-7321
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Taunton Surgical Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-3444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahim Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )

Business Address:
206 - 95 Bayly Street
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-2028

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L8
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone Number: (613) 354-6294

Business Address:
371 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 2Z7
Phone Number: (705) 324-7150


Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHIM HUSAYN ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2004