Alikhan, Neetan (CPSO#: 73705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville
Urgent Care Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive, unit 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

385 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1R9
Canada
Phone: 4164018510
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neetan Alikhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alikhan ( CPSO# 73705 )

Business Address:
Unit 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEETAN ALIKHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIKHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History