Alisic, Sarika Amelia (CPSO#: 93050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Mann, Sarika Amelia (used until: 06 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology, B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 13680
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARIKA AMELIA ALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALISIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015