Alkherayf, Fahad Abdulmohsen E (CPSO#: 80643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2218
Division of Neurosurgery
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10661
Fax: (613) 761-4833
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
The Ottawa Hospital, Cancer centre
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 10661
Fax: 613 7614833
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahad Alkherayf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Alkherayf ( CPSO# 80643 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Division of Neurosurgery
Room C2218
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 20 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHAD ABDULMOHSEN E ALKHERAYF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHERAYF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 May 2004 to 20 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 21 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011