Allain, Suzanne Marguerite (CPSO#: 59326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SJ Hospital Hospital
35 North Algoma Street
P7B 5G7
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G4
Phone: (807) 343-4367
Fax: (807) 343-4361
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 621-3775
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Allain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Allain ( CPSO# 59326 )

Business Address:
Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
580 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G4
Phone Number: (807) 343-4300

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 621-3775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARGUERITE ALLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1993