Aloudat, Sarah Ibrahim Mnazel (CPSO#: 91548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 3 Hemodialysis Unit
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Fax: 6135482524
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Aloudat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aloudat ( CPSO# 91548 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 3 Hemodialysis Unit
Nephrology Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH IBRAHIM MNAZEL ALOUDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOUDAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Nephrology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010