Alsheikh, Sultan Omar A (CPSO#: 96987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Unit 205
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-1242
Fax: (416) 431-0836
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULTAN OMAR A ALSHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 11 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017