Alsunbul, Waleed Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 87657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  27 Nov 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.A. Alsunbul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Alsunbul ( CPSO# 87657 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Division of Neurology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 08 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2009 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Waleed  Abdulaziz  Alsunbul  may  practise  neurosurgery at Hamilton
                  General  Hospital and St. Joseph's Hospital in Hamilton,  Ontario,  while
                  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Alsunbul's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Alsunbul's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 28, 2017,  and  will  expire on or
                  before November 27, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.