Altamirano-Diaz, Luis Antonio (CPSO#: 89138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Mayor de San Simon, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Street
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luis Altamirano-Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Altamirano-Diaz ( CPSO# 89138 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Room B5-122D
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Luis Antonio Altamirano-Diaz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,   University   of   Western   Ontario,  in  which  Dr.
                        Altamirano-Diaz  holds  an  academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The   certificate  of  registration  automatically   expires   when   Dr.
                  Altamirano-Diaz   no  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause
                  1.