Altmann, Karolina (CPSO#: 88093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 204-5761
Fax: (519) 204-6817
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Altmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Altmann ( CPSO# 88093 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 204-5761

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Karolina Altmann may practise medicine independently in family medicine.