Amaladoss, Alfred Michael Manickam (CPSO#: 87221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 0C2
Phone: 9053334262
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brandt Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alfred M. Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amaladoss ( CPSO# 87221 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Business Address:
Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 333-4262

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED MICHAEL MANICKAM AMALADOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMALADOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012