Amanullah, Shabbir (CPSO#: 97496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4223
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shabbir Amanullah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amanullah ( CPSO# 97496 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
Manitoba
Northwest Territories
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shabbir Amanullah may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.