Amarasekera, Dhammika Vimal Samarasinghe (CPSO#: 71841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Sri Lanka, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A
3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Phone: (416) 431-0736
Fax: (416) 431-0648
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vimal and Sukeshini Amarasekera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 18 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 28, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Dhammika Vimal Samarasinghe Amaraskera:

                  (i)   Dr. Amarasekera shall not prescribe any drug that is:
                  
                        (a)   Classified as a Narcotic Drug or Narcotic Preparation listed
                              in the Schedule to the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19, as amended, and attached hereto as Schedule "A"; or 
                  
                        (b)   Listed as a Controlled Drug in Part 1 of Schedule G of the
                              Regulations made under the Food and Drugs Act, R.S.C., 1985,
                              c.F-27, as amended, attached hereto as Schedule "B";
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Amarasekera shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting
                        room in the form set out at Schedule "C".  For further clarity,
                        this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Amarasekera has relinquished
                        his prescribing privileges wtih respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations and Controlled Drugs"; and 
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Amarasekera shalll cooperate with unannounced inspections of
                        his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the
                        purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms
                        of the Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Apr 2010
Summary:

On April 28, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Amarasekera committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Amarasekera failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession with respect to his prescribing practices for chronic care patients. Dr. Amarasekera 
was prescribing large quantities and large doses of narcotics and controlled drugs. There were 
concerns regarding Dr. Amarasekera's overall treatment of chronic care patients, his prescribing 
practices, his management of potential addiction issues, and his record-keeping practices.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Amarasekera's Certificate of Registration: 
 
      (i)   Dr. Amarasekera shall not prescribe any drug that is: 
 
            (a)   Classified as a Narcotic Drug or Narcotic Preparation listed in the 
                  Schedule to the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled 
                  Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended, and attached as 
                  Schedule "A" [to the Order]; or 
 
            (b)   Listed as a Controlled Drug in Part I of Schedule G of the Regulations 
                  made under the Food and Drugs Act, R.S.C., 1985, c. F-27 as amended, 
                  attached as Schedule "B" [to the Order]; 
 
      (ii)  Dr. Amarasekera shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form 
            set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this sign shall state as 
            follows:   "Dr. Amarasekera has relinquished his prescribing privileges with 
            respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations and Controlled Drugs"; and 
 
      (iii) Dr. Amarasekera shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
            such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and 
            enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order. 
 
2.    Dr. Amarasekera pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Amarasekera appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
      reprimand recorded on the register. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 28, 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)