Amlani, Shoaib (CPSO#: 77075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East (N.2.918)
Brampton, Ontario
L6R 3J7
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57586
Fax: (905) 494-6717
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Heart Investigation Unit
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, Ontario L8L 2X2
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46674
Fax: (905) 527-1558
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Amlani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amlani ( CPSO# 77075 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
N.2.918
Brampton ON  L6J 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOAIB AMLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMLANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2001 to 19 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2004