Anand, Jacqueline Simi Kathleen (CPSO#: 95420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Carmel Clinic
886 main st
Winnipeg MB  R2W 5L4
Phone: (204) 582-2311
Fax: (204) 582-6006
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Anand ( CPSO# 95420 )

Business Address:
Primary Health Care Unit
First Nations Health Authority
P.O. Box 4000
82 7th Avenue North
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone Number: (807) 737-6116

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SIMI KATHLEEN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013