Andrade, Jennifer Melanie (CPSO#: 64993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Skin Disorders Clinic
355 Wellington St
Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone: (519) 432-1919 Ext. 222
Fax: 519-432-9529
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Andrade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Andrade ( CPSO# 64993 )

Business Address:
London Skin Disorders Clinic
233 - 355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MELANIE ANDRADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRADE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993