Andros, Philip Peter (CPSO#: 90511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Queensland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 207-9100
Fax: (519)207-9200
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Andros ( CPSO# 90511 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 207-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP PETER ANDROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013