Angaran, Paul Anthony (CPSO#: 80993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-050, Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5104
Fax: (416) 864-5849
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Angaran ( CPSO# 80993 )

Business Address:
3020 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 666-9504

Business Address:
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 721-1999

Business Address:
002-10350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Phone Number: (905) 237-5433

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-050, Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY ANGARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008