Ansari, Ali Hashsham (CPSO#: 92501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DOCTORS URGENT CARE FAMILY MEDICINE
1145 MORNINGSIDE AVENUE, UNIT 15
Scarborough ON  M1B 0A7
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali H. Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ansari ( CPSO# 92501 )

Business Address:
15 - 1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 0A7
Phone Number: (647) 352-3621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI HASHSHAM ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011