Antoine, Louis Bernard (CPSO#: 87177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:State University of Haiti, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4801 South University Drive , 239
The Atrium
Davie, FL3 3028
Davie FL  33028
United States
Phone: (954)249-1984
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SAH General Hosp of Sault Ste Marie
Department of Psychiatry
969 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. B. Antoine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Louis Bernard Antoine may practise independently in the area of Psychiatry
            only.