Anwar Masih, Tahreem Shawar (CPSO#: 91367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6884 14 TH AVE
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Phone: 905-554-1517
Fax: 905-554-2760
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 4
6884 14 th ave
Markham ON  L6B 0S3
Canada
Phone: (905) 554-1517
Fax: (905) 554-2760
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tahreem Shawar Anwar Masih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Anwar Masih ( CPSO# 91367 )

Business Address:
6884 14th Avenue
Suite 4
Markham ON  L6B 0S3
Phone Number: (905) 554-1517

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHREEM SHAWAR ANWAR MASIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANWAR MASIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012