Appleton, Andrew James Edward (CPSO#: 92886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3071
Fax: 519-663-3073
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Appleton ( CPSO# 92886 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES EDWARD APPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014