Aptekar, Nafisa Jacob (CPSO#: 75570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Nagpur University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103,
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: (905) 456-2888
Fax: (905) 456-2868
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aptekar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aptekar ( CPSO# 75570 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Embry Healthcare Centre
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 456-2888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAFISA JACOB APTEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APTEKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2007