Aptekman, Marina (CPSO#: 95407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone: (416) 429-4991 Ext. 211
Fax: (416) 422-3573
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 359
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Canada
Phone: 416-640-5298
Fax: 416-642-2238
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA APTEKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APTEKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014