Armogan, Edward Davindra (CPSO#: 62095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
570 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6H 3E3
Phone: (519) 668-6074
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1880 sismet road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.D. Armogan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Armogan ( CPSO# 62095 )

Business Address:
570 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6H 3E3
Phone Number: (519) 681-3114

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Barbados
Guyana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jul 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. Edward Davindra Armogan (April 18, 2018) Allegations of Dr. Armogan’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Armogan is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by prescribing contrary to the terms of his May 2016 undertaking.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 3)
            As from June 20, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Edward Davindra
            Armogan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Armogan to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. EDWARD DAVINDRA ARMOGAN
                                          ("Dr. Armogan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Armogan, certificate of registration number 62095, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that I remain bound by the terms of my April
                  27, 2015 and May 13, 2016 Undertakings with the College. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, allegations that I engaged in professional
                  misconduct and/or am incompetent. 

            (5)   I, Dr. Armogan, have read the Notice of Hearing dated April 18, 2018,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (6)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (7)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (8)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (9)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (10)  I, Dr. Armogan, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Armogan's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (12)  Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)") on the terms set out below (the "Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to review with my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        every patient for whom I have prescribed any narcotic drugs,
                        narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                        targeted substances, and/or all other monitored drugs to ensure
                        that assessment, clinical examination, risk assessment for
                        addiction and on-going management and follow up is appropriate.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to ensure that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        confirms his or her review of my patient care with me as described
                        in (12)(b) above by signing the Prescribing Log and the patient
                        chart in question within two weeks of my issuing any prescription
                        for narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                        benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and/or all other
                        monitored drugs.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge the Clinical Supervisor(s) will provide
                        a report to the College at least once every month.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (ii)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Armogan, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (12)(h) and/or (i)
                        above, I will cease prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic
                        preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted
                        substances, and all other monitored drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Armogan, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                        benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                        monitored drugs as a result of section (12)(j) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (13)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (14)  Practice Restriction 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to seek a second opinion from a
                        psychiatrist where I am proposing specific dosages for psychotropic
                        medications above the stipulated amounts set out below:
                  
                        Medication              Dose 
                        Effexor                 300mg
                        Cipralex                20mg
                        Celexa                  40mg
                        Paxil                   40mg
                        Prozac                         40mg
                        Wellbutrin              300mg
                        Zoloft                  200mg
                        Cymbalta                60mg
                        Remeron                 60mg
                        Trintellix              20mg
                        Pristiq                 100mg
                  
                  
            (15)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Armogan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (18)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (19)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (20)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (21)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (22)  I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (23)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              *     Dr. Armogan cannot prescribe any narcotic drug,
                                    narcotic preparation, controlled drug, benzodiazepine
                                    and other targeted substance, or other monitored drug
                                    without the approval of a Clinical Supervisor
                                    acceptable to the College. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Armogan will engage in professional education in
                                    the prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics.
                  
                              *     Dr. Armogan shall seek a second opinion from a
                                    psychiatrist where he is proposing specific dosages for
                                    psychotropic medications above the stipulated amounts
                                    set in his undertaking
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (24)  I, Dr. Armogan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Armogan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (26)  I, Dr. Armogan, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (2 of 3)
            As from April 27, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Edward Davindra
            Armogan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Armogan to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Armogan will only prescribe psychotropic medications for patients
                  under the age of 18 after a consultation with a psychiatrist and
                  obtaining the approval of the psychiatrist for the prescription.
                  
                  
            (3 of 3)
            As from May 13, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Edward Davindra
            Armogan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Armogan to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                                          SUPPLEMENTAL
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. EDWARD DAVINDRA ARMOGAN 
                                          ("Dr. Armogan")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO 
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Armogan, certificate of registration number 62095, am a member of
                  the College.

            (2)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge and agree that I entered into an undertaking
                  with the College dated April 27, 2015 further to the College receiving
                  information about my standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that this undertaking is supplemental to the
                  April 27, 2015  Undertaking and  does  not  replace the  April  27,  2015
                  Undertaking, rather, this Undertaking is to be read in conjunction with
                  it and the April 27, 2015 Undertaking remains in full force and effect.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Armogan, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  I, Dr. Armogan, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not
                  prescribe stimulant medication for augmentation in the treatment of
                  depression, or for the treatment of adult ADHD, unless the medication is
                  first prescribed by a psychiatrist.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Armogan, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT



            (7)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (8)   I, Dr. Armogan,, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (9)   I, Dr. Armogan, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Armogan will not prescribe stimulant medication for
                        augmentation in the treatment of depression, or for the treatment
                        of adult ADHD, unless the medication is first prescribed by a
                        psychiatrist.
                  
            CONSENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Armogan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Edward Davindra Armogan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 20, 2018:

- Dr. Armogan cannot prescribe any narcotic drug, narcotic preparation, controlled drug, benzodiazepine and other targeted substance, or other monitored drug without the approval of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

- Dr. Armogan will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

- Dr. Armogan shall seek a second opinion from a psychiatrist where he is proposing specific dosages for psychotropic medications above the stipulated amounts set in his undertaking


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: May 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Edward Davindra Armogan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 13, 2016:

Dr. Armogan will not prescribe stimulant medication for augmentation in the treatment of depression, or for the treatment of adult ADHD, unless the medication is first prescribed by a psychiatrist.