Armstrong, Christopher Edward (CPSO#: 66765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Post Office Box 5010
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armstrong and Elepano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Elepano ( CPSO# 66460 )
Dr. C. Armstrong ( CPSO# 66765 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
200 - 440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 471-2929

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDWARD ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gynecological & Surgical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gynecological & Surgical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999