Arora, Vineet Iqbal (CPSO#: 60718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 5R3
Phone: (905) 574-2500
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vineet I. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2007


Corporation Name: Vineet I. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Arora ( CPSO# 60718 )

Business Address:
867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 5R3
Phone Number: (905) 574-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Jun 2015

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Arora’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Arora engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, including by breaching terms of his Undertaking by, among other things, exceeding the limit on the number of his patient encounters in a day, and by failing to maintain a call log recording patients seen while on-call.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): January 9, 2019 9:00 a.m. start

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 21 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 21, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Arora to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Arora shall have a maximum of eighty (80) patient encounters per day.