Arya, Naveen (CPSO#: 72239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone: (905) 849-0688
Fax: (905) 849-1596
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naveen Arya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Arya ( CPSO# 72239 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 849-0688

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVEEN ARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002