Asaduzzaman, Arundip (CPSO#: 95379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 631-6090
Fax: (416) 631-6535
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Asaduzzaman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUNDIP ASADUZZAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASADUZZAMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2015