Asefi, Shirin (CPSO#: 79725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Isfahan University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9206 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 7A2
Phone: (905) 709-7716
Fax: (905) 709-6474
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shirin Asefi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Asefi ( CPSO# 79725 )

Business Address:
9206 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 7A2
Phone Number: (905) 709-7716

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRIN ASEFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASEFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005