Asem, Kevin Delali (CPSO#: 88589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Western Ontario
Fowler Kennedy Sports Med Clinic
3M Centre
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Asem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Asem ( CPSO# 88589 )

Business Address:
University of Western Ontario
Fowler Kennedy Sports Med Clinic
3M Centre
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 613-3011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN DELALI ASEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2010