Ashraf, Asif Eqbal (CPSO#: 95847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3399
Fax: (905) 592-2325
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asif Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ashraf ( CPSO# 95847 )

Business Address:
Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3399

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIF EQBAL ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013