Ashtarani, Peyvand (CPSO#: 95142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: 519-235-3343
Fax: 519-235-3845
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peyvand Ashtarani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ashtarani ( CPSO# 95142 )

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital Association
Department of Family Medicine
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-3343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEYVAND ASHTARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHTARANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013