Asti, Melina (CPSO#: 80339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Universita di Milano, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS St Catharines General Site
Department of Psychiatry
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46441
Fax: (905) 397-1904
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINA ASTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Dec 2003 to 14 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2011