Athar, Humera (CPSO#: 91841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Canada
Phone: 519-258-0484
Fax: 248-258-0488
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site/ MaryvaleLocation
Department of Pyschiatry
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Humera Athar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Athar ( CPSO# 91841 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Phone Number: (519) 258-0484

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Humera  Athar  may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
            psychiatry, only.