Atta, Imran (CPSO#: 91364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 - 1807
Wonderland road north
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone: (519) 432-4330
Fax: (519) 433-4332
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Four Counties Health Services
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (519) 693-4441 Ext. 2440
Fax: (519) 693-1202
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran Atta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Atta ( CPSO# 91364 )

Business Address:
Four Counties Health Services
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441

Business Address:
201-1807 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 5C2
Phone Number: (519) 432-4330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IMRAN ATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011